Global Patent Index - EP 0929698 B1

EP 0929698 B1 2001-01-31 - METHOD FOR TANNING SKINS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TANNING SKINS

Title (de)

GERBPROZESS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TANNAGE DE PEAUX

Publication

EP 0929698 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97943935 A

Priority

  • FR 9701754 W
  • FR 9612050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2754274A1] The invention concerns a method for tanning skins to prepare leather for use in making finished goods requiring high temperatures of the order of 80 DEG C for retraction of the leather. The method consists in the following steps: first, washing the skins, then submitting them to a liming operation to enable, in a subsequent skiving operation, the separation of the skins into grain leather and flesh split, the alkaline substances contained in the grain leather being eliminated by means of an acid while the flesh splits are subjected to a pickling process for softening them, then operating a step of pre-tanning previous to the shaving operation, and a step of tanning subsequent to the shaving operation, at least using in the pre-tanning operation a mixture free from chromium sulphate with a base of aldehydes, of tannin and/or of acrylic resins. The invention consists in that the mixture further contains a silica based mineral product in colloidal suspension. The invention is useful for tanning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 3/02; C14C 1/00; C14C 1/08; C14C 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 1/00 (2006.01); C14C 1/08 (2006.01); C14C 3/02 (2006.01); C14C 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 1/00 (2013.01); C14C 1/08 (2013.01); C14C 3/02 (2013.01); C14C 3/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2754274 A1 19980410; FR 2754274 B1 19991231; AT 199026 T 20010215; AU 4559697 A 19980424; DE 69704026 D1 20010308; DE 69704026 T2 20010816; EP 0929698 A1 19990721; EP 0929698 B1 20010131; ES 2154473 T3 20010401; JP 2001503086 A 20010306; JP 3834064 B2 20061018; WO 9814620 A1 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091004

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091003

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091003

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091005

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091003

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-07-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: JALLATTE S.A.

- Free text: JALLATTE S.A.#RUE DU FORT#30170 SAINT-HIPPOLYTE-DU-FORT (FR) -TRANSFER TO- JALLATTE S.A.#RUE DU FORT#30170 SAINT-HIPPOLYTE-DU-FORT (FR)

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154473 T3

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DIGIOVANNI SCHMIEDT S.R.L.

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704026 20010308

2001-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199026 T 20010215

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JALLATTE S.A.

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000704

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990419

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI