Global Patent Index - EP 0929707 B1

EP 0929707 B1 2002-11-20 - MECHANICAL LOOM WITH AT LEAST ONE CONTROL PANEL

Title (en)

MECHANICAL LOOM WITH AT LEAST ONE CONTROL PANEL

Title (de)

WEBMASCHINE MIT WENIGSTENS EINER SCHALTTAFEL

Title (fr)

METIER A TISSER PRESENTANT AU MOINS UN TABLEAU DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 0929707 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943894 A

Priority

  • BE 9600822 A
  • EP 9705233 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814652A1] The invention concerns a mechanical loom with at least one control panel (18) for controlling a drive system. According to the invention, the control panel is held by means of a support (16) which is mounted on a holder part (12) of a functional element (9), which holder part (12) can be adjusted and secured in the width of the mechanical loom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/02; D03D 51/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/02 (2006.01); D03D 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/00 (2013.01); D03D 49/02 (2013.01); D03D 51/02 (2013.01); D03D 51/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814652 A1 19980409; BE 1010657 A3 19981103; DE 59708781 D1 20030102; EP 0929707 A1 19990721; EP 0929707 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free text: PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE)

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708781 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010102

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990113

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI