Global Patent Index - EP 0929730 B1

EP 0929730 B1 2000-09-20 - SUNSHADE FOR WINDOWS OR DOORS

Title (en)

SUNSHADE FOR WINDOWS OR DOORS

Title (de)

SONNENSCHUTZ FÜR FENSTER ODER TÜREN

Title (fr)

PARE-SOLEIL POUR FENETRES OU PORTES

Publication

EP 0929730 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929217 A

Priority

  • DE 29611113 U
  • EP 9703188 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9749888A1] The invention relates to a sunshade for windows or doors, in particular for roof windows (1). Said sunshade comprises a flexible sheet (2) and a holding device (3) which can fix said sheet (2) to the outside of the window (1) or the door. Said sheet (2) consists of a roller blind engaging over the window (1) to cover the surface and to project beyond the window frame (4). Said roller blind is mounted with the winding roller (5) thereof in a box (7) which is in the lower window area and is attached preferably to the lower transverse spar (6a) of the window frame (1) or the window casement (6). Said blind can be detachably fixed by the removal end (2a) thereof to holding devices (3) provided on the upper transverse spar (4a) of the window frame (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/40; E06B 9/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/40 (2013.01); E06B 2009/546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29611113 U1 19960912; AT 196526 T 20001015; EP 0929730 A1 19990721; EP 0929730 B1 20000920; WO 9749888 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2003-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BALTSCHUKAT HANS-OTTO

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000920

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702386 20001026

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196526 T 20001015

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990830

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990409

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL