Global Patent Index - EP 0929738 B1

EP 0929738 B1 2001-05-23 - HONEYCOMBED BODY WITH HEAT INSULATION, PREFERABLY FOR AN EXHAUST GAS CATALYZER

Title (en)

HONEYCOMBED BODY WITH HEAT INSULATION, PREFERABLY FOR AN EXHAUST GAS CATALYZER

Title (de)

WABENKÖRPER MIT WÄRMEISOLIERUNG, VORZUGSWEISE FÜR EINEN ABGASKATALYSATOR

Title (fr)

CORPS ALVEOLE A ISOLATION THERMIQUE, DE PREFERENCE POUR POT CATALYTIQUE

Publication

EP 0929738 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97910300 A

Priority

  • DE 19641049 A
  • EP 9705098 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19641049A1] The invention concerns a honeycombed body with a plurality of honeycombs and heat insulation (43) comprising a plurality of stacked and/or wound insulating metal layers (4; 34) which support one another owing to microstructures (5) formed in the insulating metal sheets (34), such that spaces are produced between the latter. The microstructures (5) are between 10 mu m and 250 mu m high. In this way, the heat losses from the honeycombed body to the environment are only low.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; B01D 53/94; B01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/86 (2006.01); B01J 35/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); B01J 35/04 (2013.01); F01N 3/281 (2013.01); F01N 3/2821 (2013.01); F01N 3/2864 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 2330/04 (2013.01); F01N 2330/321 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1234 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12417 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24149 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19641049 A1 19980409; AU 4775097 A 19980505; CN 1082133 C 20020403; CN 1232526 A 19991020; EP 0929738 A1 19990721; EP 0929738 B1 20010523; ES 2158516 T3 20010901; JP 2001501705 A 20010206; JP 4166832 B2 20081015; KR 100495790 B1 20050617; KR 20000048541 A 20000725; MY 121648 A 20060228; TW 384345 B 20000311; US 6040064 A 20000321; WO 9815724 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150918

2016-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161027

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150917

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150917

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150917

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703615

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158516 T3

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703615 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990413

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT