Global Patent Index - EP 0929739 B1

EP 0929739 B1 2001-12-05 - HONEYCOMB BODY WITH REDUCED HEAT CONDUCTIVITY IN INFLOW AND OUTFLOW AREAS

Title (en)

HONEYCOMB BODY WITH REDUCED HEAT CONDUCTIVITY IN INFLOW AND OUTFLOW AREAS

Title (de)

WABENKÖRPER MIT VERRINGERTER WÄRMELEITFÄHIGKEIT IM EINTRITTS- UND AUSTRITTSBEREICH

Title (fr)

CORPS EN NID D'ABEILLES PRESENTANT UNE CONDUCTIBILITE THERMIQUE REDUITE DANS LA ZONE D'ENTREE ET DANS LA ZONE DE SORTIE

Publication

EP 0929739 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944887 A

Priority

  • DE 19639633 A
  • EP 9705096 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19639633A1] The invention concerns a structure (1), that can be cross flown by a fluid, specially a honeycomb body for an exhaust gas catalyst. Said structure has an inflow area (2) and an outflow area (3) having channels to be cross flown by a fluid. The disclosed structure has near the inflow and the outflow areas (2, 3) respectively a section (6, 10) with reduced heat conductivity, which has recesses (7, 9) formed in the wall of at least some channels (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; B01D 53/94; B01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/86 (2006.01); B01J 35/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F28F 13/14 (2006.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); B01J 35/04 (2013.01); F01N 3/2803 (2013.01); F28F 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 2330/02 (2013.01); F01N 2330/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19639633 A1 19980402; AU 4623697 A 19980417; EP 0929739 A1 19990721; EP 0929739 B1 20011205; JP 2001500785 A 20010123; JP 4098363 B2 20080611; KR 100307076 B1 20010924; KR 20000048657 A 20000725; WO 9813590 A1 19980402

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705700

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150917

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150917

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150917

2016-03-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EMITEC GESELLSCHAFT FUER EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE MBH, 53797 LOHMAR, DE

- Document: DE 59705700

2016-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705700

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705700 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000911

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT