Global Patent Index - EP 0929783 B1

EP 0929783 B1 2002-11-27 - COLLECTOR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A PARTITIONING MADE OF CROSSING FLAT STRIPS

Title (en)

COLLECTOR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH A PARTITIONING MADE OF CROSSING FLAT STRIPS

Title (de)

SAMMLER EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE MIT KAMMERUNTERTEILUNG AUS SICH KREUZENDEN FLACHSTEGEN

Title (fr)

COLLECTEUR D'UN ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR AVEC UN CLOISONNEMENT FORME PAR DES MOULURES PLATES ENTRECROISEES

Publication

EP 0929783 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924278 A

Priority

  • DE 19719254 A
  • EP 9802635 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719254A1] A collector (18) for a motor vehicle heat exchanger has a structure in at least two parts, with a tube bottom (26) and a lid (28) which together from the housing of the collector (18), possibly with at least one additional component part. A partitioning (30) made of crossing flat strips (32, 38, 40) is arranged in the collector (18). The partitioning (30) is an integral diecast piece made of a weldable material

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F28F 9/0217 (2013.01); Y10S 165/906 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719254 A1 19981112; DE 19719254 B4 20050818; BR 9804888 A 19990831; CN 1225718 A 19990811; EP 0929783 A1 19990721; EP 0929783 B1 20021127; US 6082448 A 20000704; WO 9850747 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990122

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR