Global Patent Index - EP 0929789 B1

EP 0929789 B1 2001-12-19 - A MINE-DISPOSAL ASSEMBLY AND THE WAY OF ITS OPERATING

Title (en)

A MINE-DISPOSAL ASSEMBLY AND THE WAY OF ITS OPERATING

Title (de)

MINENRÄUMVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE DEMINAGE ET SON MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 0929789 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97943284 A

Priority

  • SK 9700009 W
  • SK 124996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814748A1] Mine-disposal assembly composed of a conveyance, preferably a lorry (1) and a conveyance-independent mine-disposal unit consisting of a service workplace (2) with a remote controller (21) and of a mobile fully-hydraulic mine-disposal machine (3) with a receiver (31). The mine-disposal machine (3) without any service staff is furnished with mine-activating equipement (4) in the front. The mobility, revolving of mine-activating flails and the other auxiliary functions are remote-controlled from the distant service workplace (2) means of the radio signals (213). The front of the mine-disposal machine (3) is protected by a protective shield (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814748 A1 19980409; AU 4479197 A 19980424; CA 2267201 A1 19980409; DE 69709380 D1 20020131; DE 69709380 T2 20020711; EP 0929789 A1 19990721; EP 0929789 B1 20011219; SK 124996 A3 19990413; SK 280321 B6 19991108

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-05-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709380 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IE IT SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLING INDUSTRY, A.S.

1999-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLING, A.S

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IE IT SE