Global Patent Index - EP 0929868 A4

EP 0929868 A4 2000-07-26 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC MANAGEMENT OF SUMMONING, IDENTIFYING, SELF-TESTING AND/OR SELF-TUTORING OF SUBJECTS

Title (en)

A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC MANAGEMENT OF SUMMONING, IDENTIFYING, SELF-TESTING AND/OR SELF-TUTORING OF SUBJECTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SELBSTTÄTIGEN BETREIBEN EINER ANORDNUNG ZUR AUFFODERUNG, ZUR IDENTIFIKATION ZUM SELBSTTEST UND/ODER FÜR DEN SELBSTUNTERRICHT VON PROBANDEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE ASSURANT LA GESTION AUTOMATIQUE DE CONVOCATION, D'IDENTIFICATION, D'AUTO-EVALUATION ET/OU DE CONSEIL DE SUJETS

Publication

EP 0929868 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97928409 A

Priority

  • IL 9700220 W
  • IL 11877196 A
  • US 4216197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802083A2] A system for automatically managing summoning to a session including at least one of self-testing and self-tutoring at least one subject which includes a summoning apparatus for summoning at least one subject to said session, apparatus for performing said session and a control apparatus for controlling said summoning and said session. A system and a method for automatic self-testing of vision. The system includes an optical testing unit for testing vision of a user and a computer connected to said optical testing unit. The computer controls the optical testing unit, receives data from the optical testing unit and processes and stores the test results. The system includes input devices for receiving user input and devices for providing automatic tutoring and training to the user. The system may also include devices for identifying the user. The system may also include devices for providing a report of the test results and for communicating the report to another local or remote computer. The method includes providing the user with self-tutoring and self-training for performing the self-testing, automatically administering at least one vision test to the user; and storing the results of the test in a database. The method may also include identifying the user prior to testing, and providing a report of the test results. The optical testing unit presents at least one eye of the user with visual test images including a single test pattern and a multiple-choice answer pattern, receives answers selected by the user and analyzes the answers to determine the test result. The visual test images may be randomly or pseudo-randomly selected from a predetermined group of images for preventing the user from predicting the answers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 3/02; A61B 5/00; A61B 5/117

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/02 (2006.01); A61B 5/117 (2006.01); A61B 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/02 (2013.01); A61B 5/117 (2013.01); A61B 5/1171 (2016.02); G06K 9/00604 (2013.01); A61B 5/121 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802083 A2 19980122; WO 9802083 A3 19980226; AU 3271397 A 19980209; CA 2259978 A1 19980122; EP 0929868 A2 19990721; EP 0929868 A4 20000726; JP 2000517442 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 3/02 A, 7A 61B 5/00 B, 7A 61B 5/117 B

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 3/02 A, 7A 61B 5/00 B

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990129

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE