Global Patent Index - EP 0930023 B1

EP 0930023 B1 2002-09-18 - Method and device for producing a cigarette rod with an insert

Title (en)

Method and device for producing a cigarette rod with an insert

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Herstellen eines Zigarettenstranges mit einer Einlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'une tige de cigarette avec un insert

Publication

EP 0930023 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100300 A

Priority

DE 19801641 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930023A1] Empty or tobacco-filled tubes are continuously conveyed from a production machine to a tobacco-feeder-area (15,27) where the tube is enclosed in a line of tobacco. A meter for assessing the slack of the tube (1) is positioned between the production machine and feeder area. The tube is conveyed at an angle into a first zone (15) of a suction-belt (16) on which a thin layer of tobacco is placed, and then to a second adjacent zone (27) where a further covering of tobacco on the pipe and tobacco layer is provided. A leveler (22) evens out the tobacco layer (14). An Independent claim is also included for the apparatus used for producing a line of cigarettes with tubular inserts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/34 (2006.01); A24C 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/1885 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930023 A1 19990721; EP 0930023 B1 20020918; AT 224151 T 20021015; CN 1123300 C 20031008; CN 1225805 A 19990818; DE 19801641 A1 19990722; ES 2181326 T3 20030216; JP H11266850 A 19991005; PL 188565 B1 20050228; PL 330838 A1 19990719; US 6202648 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090109

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090109

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090109

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-01-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181326 T3

2003-01-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902706 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224151 T 20021015

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI