Global Patent Index - EP 0930099 A3

EP 0930099 A3 2000-07-19 - Centrifuge, in particular sliding seal free continuous flow centrifuge for the centrifugation of biological fluids

Title (en)

Centrifuge, in particular sliding seal free continuous flow centrifuge for the centrifugation of biological fluids

Title (de)

Zentrifuge, insbesondere gleitdichtungsfreie Durchflusszentrifuge zum Zentrifugieren biologischer Fluide

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse, en particulier centrifugeuse à l'écoulement contenu sans joint d'étanchéité glissant pour la centrifugation de fluides biologiques

Publication

EP 0930099 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101002 A

Priority

DE 19801767 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930099A2] One and/or the other transmission has couplings (17-20) to transmit the torque through magnetic forces. The centrifuge has a working transmission to transfer the torque to a separation unit (3) and a second working transmission to transfer the torque to the rotating frame (1). The couplings have magnets (15,16) located on a circular line. The poles of adjacent magnets of a coupling are arranged in opposition. The coupling (17-20) is a body with the shape of a circular disk. Or one and/or the other transmission has two rotating couplings on a common axis, with a magnetic lock through magnets arranged on a circular line at the upper and lower sides of the coupling. Or the couplings rotate on parallel axes, with a magnetic lock action. The couplings (17,19) can rotate on axes at right angles to each other, with the magnets (15,23) on a circular line at their peripheral surfaces, or the magnets are at the peripheral surface of one coupling and on the upper or lower side of the other coupling on a circular line. The magnets have a circular cross section, or a rectangular cross section where their longitudinal sides are aligned on a radial direction. The gaps between the magnets are equal in both matching couplings. The separation unit (3) is bonded to one coupling (19), which has a magnetic lock with another coupling (17) which has an axis across the axis of the rotating frame. The second coupling has a magnetic lock with a third coupling (20) at the frame (21), concentric to the first coupling. A fourth coupling (14), opposite the second coupling, rotates on an axis at right angles to the rotating frame (1) axis, with a magnetic lock at the first (19) and third (20) couplings. The rotating frame is rotated by a hollow shaft, with a coaxial drive shaft linked to the first coupling. A second coupling is bonded to the separation unit, with a magnetic lock at the first coupling. Or a second coupling is in the rotating frame on an axis parallel to the frame rotary axis, with a magnetic lock at the first coupling for the separation unit, and with a larger diameter than the first coupling. The rotating frame forms the third coupling, for a magnetic grip with the second coupling. The second coupling in the rotating frame can rotate round the rotating frame axis, with a magnet grip at the first coupling, and a third coupling rotates on an axis parallel to the rotating frame axis with a gearing link to the second coupling, while the rotating frame forms a fourth coupling with a magnetic lock at the third coupling. The separation unit (3) is within the rotating frame (1). In an alternative form, the first and/or second transmission has at least one stator with a first and/or second coil. The system has a magnetic coupling so that the torque forces are transmitted by a magnetic grip. The rotating frame has an upper and lower carrier plate, with the separation unit at the upper plate and the stator between the plates and linked to one and/or the other coil. Permanent magnets give the coupling grip action. The first coil generates a rotating field to transmit the torque to the separation unit. The permanent magnets are equidistant round the periphery at the under side of the separation unit, with the poles in opposition at adjacent magnets. The second coil generates a rotating field for the magnetic coupling of the rotating frame, with permanent magnets equidistant at the lower plate of the frame, with opposing polarity at neighboring magnets. The lower carrier plate of the rotating frame is at a support body extending in the rotating frame, as a mounting for the stator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/02 (2006.01); B04B 5/00 (2006.01); B04B 5/04 (2006.01); B04B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 9/08 (2013.01); B04B 5/0442 (2013.01); F23C 2900/03002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930099 A2 19990721; EP 0930099 A3 20000719; EP 0930099 B1 20020508; DE 19801767 C1 19991007; ES 2177143 T3 20021201; JP 4388154 B2 20091224; JP H11262681 A 19990928; US 6280375 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160119

2017-02-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170227

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160118

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160118

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160118

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901370

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901370

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177143 T3

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901370 20020613

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI