Global Patent Index - EP 0930105 B1

EP 0930105 B1 2002-11-06 - Method for varnishing manufactured articles made of wood or wood fibre, varnished article made of wood fibre, and varnishing kit

Title (en)

Method for varnishing manufactured articles made of wood or wood fibre, varnished article made of wood fibre, and varnishing kit

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Lackieren von Holz- oder Holzfaserngegenständen, lackierter Holzfaserngegenstand, und Lackierbedarf

Title (fr)

Méthode pour vernir des objets manufacturés en bois ou en fibre de bois, objet vernis en fibre de bois, et matériaux pour le vernissage

Publication

EP 0930105 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200076 A

Priority

  • EP 99200076 A
  • EP 98830012 A
  • EP 98830223 A
  • EP 98202962 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930105A1] The present invention relates to a method for varnishing manufactured articles made of wood or wood fibre, this method comprising, in sequence, a stage of rubbing down the surface of the manufactured article, a stage of preheating the manufactured article, a stage of applying one or more layers of a primer to the surface of the manufactured article, a stage of heating the manufactured article and a stage of varnishing the manufactured article with a powdered varnish. The powder-varnishing method according to the invention makes it possible, compared with conventional techniques using liquid varnishes, to reduce considerably the use of pollutants such as varnishes and solvents. The method according to the invention also makes it possible to recover up to 97% of the powder used, which can then be returned into the productive cycle, thereby substantially reducing the production costs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/08; B05D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/04 (2006.01); B05D 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/045 (2013.01); B05D 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930105 A1 19990721; EP 0930105 B1 20021106; AT 227169 T 20021115; DE 69903757 D1 20021212; DE 69903757 T2 20030717; ES 2187114 T3 20030516; SI 0930105 T1 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080113

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LUCCHINI ALESSANDRO

- Effective date: 20060131

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-12-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20061010

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-10-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-01-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-01-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-01-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-01-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-03-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187114 T3

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400390

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.P.A.

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903757 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000117

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227169 T 20021115

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUCCHINI, ALESSANDRO

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUCCHINI, ALESSANDRO

2002-01-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR VARNISHING MANUFACTURED ARTICLES MADE OF WOOD OR WOOD FIBRE, VARNISHED ARTICLE MADE OF WOOD FIBRE, AND VARNISHING KIT

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000117

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI