Global Patent Index - EP 0930108 A3

EP 0930108 A3 2001-01-24 - Device for depositing wire windings

Title (en)

Device for depositing wire windings

Title (de)

Ablegevorrichtung zum Ablegen von Windungen aus Draht

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dépot de boucles de fil

Publication

EP 0930108 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100480 A

Priority

DE 19801406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930108A2] The assembly to lay wire coils (3), with a wire axis on a conveyor belt (5), has a rotating coil layer (1) followed by shears (6). The cutting shears (6) have a fixed blade and a moving blade (7,8), with a blade drive motor to move the blade in the cutting direction (10) at a set cutting speed. The moving blade (8) has a separation plate (11) to divide the severed unusable coils from the usable coils laid on the conveyor belt. The cutting blade (8) and separation plate (11) have a rotating movement. A leading sensor (12) registers the leading end of the wire (3) to trigger the cutting shears (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14; B21C 47/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/26 (2013.01); B21C 47/143 (2013.01); B21C 47/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930108 A2 19990721; EP 0930108 A3 20010124; EP 0930108 B1 20030312; AT 234169 T 20030315; DE 19801406 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-02-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-01-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904507 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020115

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI