Global Patent Index - EP 0930130 B1

EP 0930130 B1 2003-06-11 - Clamping device

Title (en)

Clamping device

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage

Publication

EP 0930130 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100659 A

Priority

DE 19801433 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930130A2] The clamping system consists of a pneumatic or hydraulically operated adjusting drive with an interface for the pressure medium and the electro-connections (2, 8). The system is designed so that at the side of the adjusting drive away from the head, functionally different connection modules (I to IV) are oriented to each other formed at right angles to the axis of the adjusting drive and interface for the pressure medium connections (2). The connection modules are designed as end piece and intermediate piece modules. A connecting module (V, V') is provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06; B25B 5/12; B25B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B25B 5/16 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/061 (2013.01); B25B 5/122 (2013.01); B25B 5/16 (2013.01); F15B 15/202 (2013.01); F15B 15/2807 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930130 A2 19990721; EP 0930130 A3 20010207; EP 0930130 B1 20030611; DE 19801433 A1 19990722; ES 2195453 T3 20031201

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130115

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905895 P 20030717

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI