Global patent index - EP 0930139 A3

EP 0930139 A3 2000-10-25 - Method of cutting up logs, frame for carrying out the method and use of the frame

Title (en)

Method of cutting up logs, frame for carrying out the method and use of the frame

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufschneiden von Langholz, Gestell zum Durchführen des Verfahrens und Verwendung des Gestelles

Title (fr)

Procédé de coupe de troncs d'arbres, chassis pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0930139 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100709 A

Priority

  • DE 19801432 A
  • DE 19849133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930139A2] The frame is placed horizontally on the ground, transporter or shelf (2) for stacking the long pieces of (26) wood in preset cutup lengths (30-32). The uprights (6-8) hold the timber in the frame. The frame base has parallel outer flat-iron supports which are used for the next-above stack (27,28,29) of logs. The bottom frame part may have runners.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 17/0041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930139 A2 19990721; EP 0930139 A3 20001025; DE 29900571 U1 19991007

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI