Global patent index - EP 0930153 A3

EP 0930153 A3 2000-01-05 - Device for compacting materials

Title (en)

Device for compacting materials

Title (de)

Materialverdichtungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de compactage de matériaux

Publication

EP 0930153 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124614 A

Priority

  • DE 29722839 U
  • DE 29807425 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930153A2] The compressor (1) has a housing (2) with a driven conveyor worm (4). The drive end (8) of the conveyor is turnably fastened to the housing and is connected to the drive unit (3) via a transmission (11). The other worm end projects freely towards the collection chamber (7) for the compressed material. The drive end is formed by a drive shaft (9), which projects outwards through a shaft aperture (10) in the housing. The housing has an upper intake (5) formed by the top end (20) of an intake funnel (21), which is open at the bottom. The funnel contains a dispenser for a cleaning and/or desinfecting and/or processing material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/30; B65B 1/12; B65F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2006.01); B65B 1/12 (2006.01); B65B 1/24 (2006.01); B65F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0082 (2013.01); B30B 9/3082 (2013.01); B30B 9/3096 (2013.01); B65B 1/12 (2013.01); B65B 1/24 (2013.01); B65F 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930153 A2 19990721; EP 0930153 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021002

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010918

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000504;RO PAYMENT 20000504

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR COMPACTING MATERIALS

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LATTONI,GUIDO

1999-08-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALDA,LUCIANO

1999-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALDA,LUCIANO

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI