Global Patent Index - EP 0930158 B1

EP 0930158 B1 2001-05-02 - Referencing method for a machine or installation

Title (en)

Referencing method for a machine or installation

Title (de)

Referenzierverfahren für eine Maschine oder Anlage

Title (fr)

Procédé pour établir des références dans une machine ou installation

Publication

EP 0930158 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100862 A

Priority

DE 19801755 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930158A1] The method is carried out, so that with the drawing in (v1) of the object or the objects and/or the accelerations (t3) of the function components (1) on their working speeds (v2), a relation or a reference and/or a synchronization are produced between the driven function components of the machine or the plant. One or more sensors are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01); B41P 2233/10 (2013.01); B41P 2233/13 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9816384 A1 19980423 - GOSS GRAPHIC SYSTEMS LIMITED [GB], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930158 A1 19990721; EP 0930158 B1 20010502; AT 200877 T 20010515; ES 2156451 T3 20010616

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180801

2018-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900077

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140119

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200877 T

- Effective date: 20140119

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900077

- Representative's name: INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY IP-GOETZ PATENT- UND REC, DE

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060120

2006-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-10 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG CT IP A&D Z.

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: REXROTH INDRAMAT GMBH

2003-01-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-01-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030119

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG CT IP A&D Z.HD. H. WOELTIEN

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: REXROTH INDRAMAT GMBH

2002-03-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG ABTEILUNG CT IP A&D Z.HD. H. WOELTIEN

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-03-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: REXROTH INDRAMAT GMBH

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-03-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156451 T3

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900077 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200877 T 20010515

2000-05-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991124

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI