Global patent index - EP 0930159 B1

EP 0930159 B1 2001-04-11 - Rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine rotative d'impression

Publication

EP 0930159 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106200 A

Priority

  • DE 4344896 A
  • DE 4344912 A
  • DE 4405658 A
  • EP 94810752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0644048A2] A rotary printing machine has blanket cylinders and plate cylinders which are arranged in cylinder units in couples by means of a mechanical coupler for their common drive. Such a cylinder unit is driven in each case by its own drive motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/004; B41F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 13/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01); B65H 2557/2644 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0644048 A2 19950322; EP 0644048 A3 19950628; EP 0644048 B1 19990707; EP 0644048 B2 20050323; AT 181879 T 19990715; AT 200449 T 20010415; AT 216317 T 20020515; AT 524311 T 20110915; CN 1061301 C 20010131; CN 1122279 A 19960515; DE 59408463 D1 19990812; DE 59409732 D1 20010517; DE 59410108 D1 20020523; DK 0644048 T3 20000131; DK 0644048 T4 20050502; DK 0930159 T3 20010813; DK 0930160 T3 20020729; EP 0930159 A1 19990721; EP 0930159 B1 20010411; EP 0930160 A1 19990721; EP 0930160 B1 20020417; EP 1155826 A2 20011121; EP 1155826 A3 20020626; EP 1155826 B1 20110914; ES 2135557 T3 19991101; ES 2135557 T5 20050901; ES 2157676 T3 20010816; ES 2175867 T3 20021116; JP 3415469 B2 20030609; JP 3424999 B2 20030707; JP H0834108 A 19960206; JP H11268249 A 19991005; RU 2127668 C1 19990320; RU 94045261 A 19961210

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111228

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111227

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111227

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 200449

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111228

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59409732

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-07-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *WIFAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20111231

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-10-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-08-17 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20050518

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KBA KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, -LIZENZEN

2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: READ MATTHEWS CHARLES VENNER SHIPLEY & CO.

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KBA KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, -LIZENZEN -

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: READ MATTHEWS CHARLES VENNER SHIPLEY & CO.

2002-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KBA KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, -LIZENZEN -

- Effective date: 20020105

2002-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: READ MATTHEWS CHARLES VENNER SHIPLEY & CO.

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157676

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409732

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 644048

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200449

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000523

1999-10-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1999-10-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

- Inventor name: KOCH, DIETER

1999-10-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

- Inventor name: MIESCHER, ANDREAS

1999-10-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

- Inventor name: ZAHND, ANDREAS

1999-10-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

1999-10-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

- Inventor name: KOCH, DIETER

1999-10-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

- Inventor name: MIESCHER, ANDREAS

1999-10-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

- Inventor name: ZAHND, ANDREAS

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, FELIX

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KOCH, DIETER

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MIESCHER, ANDREAS

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZAHND, ANDREAS

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990409

1999-07-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 644048

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE