Global Patent Index - EP 0930233 A3

EP 0930233 A3 2001-01-31 - Method of and device for adjusting position for cutting bags and packaging machine incorporating same

Title (en)

Method of and device for adjusting position for cutting bags and packaging machine incorporating same

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einstellen der Schneideposition von Beuteln und mit diesen ausgestattete Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour régler la position de coupe de sacs et machine d'emballage comportant ceux-ci

Publication

EP 0930233 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300156 A

Priority

JP 2275098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930233A2] A form-fill-seal packaging machine produces a dummy bag from a film (100) by starting to move seal jaws (51) after the film has been pulled over a specified length or for a specified length of time from the moment when an eye mark on the film is detected by a detector (95). If the position on the film (100) at which it was cut is displaced from the intended position, this displacement is inputted such that the specified length or the specified length of time is automatically corrected. If any of the parameters defining the pattern of transverse sealing operation is changed, the specified length or the specified length of time can also be automatically adjusted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/20; B65B 51/30; B65B 57/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 41/00 (2006.01); B65B 57/02 (2006.01); B65B 57/04 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/306 (2013.01); B65B 9/20 (2013.01); B65B 9/2021 (2013.01); B65B 9/2028 (2013.01); B65B 57/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930233 A2 19990721; EP 0930233 A3 20010131; EP 0930233 B1 20140312; JP 3971833 B2 20070905; JP H11208620 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140312

2015-03-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69945024

- Effective date: 20141215

2015-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20141215

2014-12-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69945024

2014-04-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69945024

- Effective date: 20140424

2014-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2014-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-09-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130805

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 9/20 A, 7B 65B 51/30 B, 7B 65B 57/08 B

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI