Global Patent Index - EP 0930261 A3

EP 0930261 A3 2000-03-15 - Method and device for winding of a slitted web to rolls

Title (en)

Method and device for winding of a slitted web to rolls

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wickeln von Teilbahnen zu Teilbahnrollen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour enrouler des bandes refendues en rouleaux

Publication

EP 0930261 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100610 A

Priority

DE 19801874 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930261A2] The rolls of part-lengths in at least two groups of winding positions, are axially staggered in relation to one central roller in differing peripheral positions. A cutter (33) extends axially over all the winding positions and a central roller (8) moves round all the groups of winding positions (20,21). The cutter is combined with a holder fixing a part-length on the surface of the central roller. An Independent claim is also included for the apparatus used for winding the part lengths onto part rolls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/08; B65H 23/26; B65H 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2284 (2013.01); B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41892 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41894 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51539 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930261 A2 19990721; EP 0930261 A3 20000315; EP 0930261 B1 20030507; DE 19801874 A1 19990722; US 6176449 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905375

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120114

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905375

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020219

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI