Global patent index - EP 0930262 A3

EP 0930262 A3 2000-05-03 - Package inspection device

Title (en)

Package inspection device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Überwachen der Qualität von Garnwickeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour surveiller la qualité des enroulements de fil

Publication

EP 0930262 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120585 A

Priority

JP 2140398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930262A2] An intake member 15 which sucks in the tip of a loosened bunch winding yarn W and removes it from the inspection area of package P is arranged in a package inspection device. Since the loosened bunch winding yarn W is removed from the inspection area by the intake member, the tip of the loosened bunch winding is prevented from unraveling from the package, entering the inspection area, and interfering with the inspection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/89 (2006.01); B65H 63/00 (2006.01); D01H 13/26 (2006.01); D06H 3/08 (2006.01); G01N 21/892 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/006 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5315366 A 19940524 - INADA KENICHI [JP], et al
  • [DAP] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930262 A2 19990721; EP 0930262 A3 20000503; JP H11200164 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020123

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI