Global Patent Index - EP 0930265 B1

EP 0930265 B1 2001-05-23 - Corkscrew

Title (en)

Corkscrew

Title (de)

Korkenzieher

Title (fr)

Tire-bouchon

Publication

EP 0930265 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811168 A

Priority

CH 6998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930265A1] The ends of holder elements (3,4) facing a turning part (5) are detachably or firmly joined, or integrally part of, the housing (2). The ends of the holder elements facing away from the turning part have fitments (16-23) engaging with the collar (25) of a bottleneck (26), to form a snap closure. The housing has a holder-pin (29) for supporting the holders and the rotary part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/0441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930265 A1 19990721; EP 0930265 B1 20010523; AT 201384 T 20010615; CA 2255986 A1 19990715; DE 59800755 D1 20010628; HK 1020273 A1 20011214

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-10-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800755

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-10-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800755

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WEIBEL INNOVATE GMBH

- Free text: WEIBEL INNOVATE GMBH#GISLEREN 2#3266 WILER B. SEEDORF (CH) -TRANSFER TO- WEIBEL INNOVATE GMBH#GISLEREN 2#3266 WILER B. SEEDORF (CH)

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZYLISS HAUSHALTWAREN A.G.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061126

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061126

2007-07-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2007-07-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-07-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZYLISS AG

- Free text: ZYLISS AG#SCHACHENWEG 24#3250 LYSS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ZYLISS AG#EGGBUEHLSTRASSE 28#8050 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZYLISS AG

- Free text: ZYLISS HAUSHALTWAREN AG#SCHACHENWEG 24#CH-3250 LYSS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ZYLISS AG#SCHACHENWEG 24#3250 LYSS (CH)

2007-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WEIBEL INNOVATE GMBH

- Free text: DKB HOUSEHOLD AG#EGGBUEHLSTRASSE 28#8050 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- WEIBEL INNOVATE GMBH#GISLEREN 2#3266 WILER B. SEEDORF (CH)

2007-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DKB HOUSEHOLD AG

- Free text: ZYLISS AG#EGGBUEHLSTRASSE 28#8050 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- DKB HOUSEHOLD AG#EGGBUEHLSTRASSE 28#8050 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061126

2006-01-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800755 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201384 T 20010615

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000127

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI