Global Patent Index - EP 0930391 B1

EP 0930391 B1 2002-11-20 - A fabric shearing machine

Title (en)

A fabric shearing machine

Title (de)

Schermaschine für Stoffbahnen

Title (fr)

Tondeuse pour étoffes textiles

Publication

EP 0930391 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500002 A

Priority

ES 9800087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930391A1] A fabric shearing machine, having one or more shearing units, provided with a shearing drum (2) having shearing blades (4) equipped with first cutting edges (6) which respectively describe one same cylindrical path (8); a sheet (10) having a second cutting edge which makes contact with the first cutting edges (6) in operation; a table (14) having a surface for guiding the fabric (12) up to an area (16) in close proximity to the second cutting edge and lubricating means for lubricating said first cutting edges (6) and said second cutting edge, comprising a fibrous member (20) impregnable with a fatty fluid and adapted to remain in contact with said shearing blades (4). At least four fifths by volume of said fibrous member (20) are situated at a level below the level at which said area (16) in close proximity to said second cutting edge is situated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930391 A1 19990721; EP 0930391 B1 20021120; DE 69903981 D1 20030102; ES 2154533 A1 20010401; ES 2154533 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-02-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903981 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010905

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI