Global patent index - EP 0930392 A3

EP 0930392 A3 2001-01-10 - Press section

Title (en)

Press section

Title (de)

Pressenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de pressage

Publication

EP 0930392 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121011 A

Priority

DE 19801891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930392A2] In the press section of a papermaking machine, and the like, the press gap (5) at the leading press unit (2) in the direction (4) of web travel is formed by a shoe roller (6) and a suction roller (15). The web (1) is supported by at least one belt or fourdrinier or blanket during transfer from a leading fourdrinier stage (7) to a following drying stage (8). The following press gap (9) in the direction (4) of belt travel, with a double blanket passing through with the web, has at least one roller with a controlled bend, as a shoe roller (10). The press section is formed by only two press gaps (5,9) The web (1) passes through the press section while supported by at least one water-extraction blanket (11,12). A blanket (11) at the first press takes the web (1) from the fourdrinier section. The second blanket (12), at the other side of the web (1), transfers the web from the first blanket (11) at the at the leading press (2) to carry it through the second press (3) and onwards to the following drying section. The first blanket (11) for the web (1) passes round the suction roller (15) at the first press (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930392 A2 19990721; EP 0930392 A3 20010110; EP 0930392 B1 20050202; CA 2260115 A1 19990720; DE 19801891 A1 19990722; US 6589390 B1 20030708

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071106

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-03-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812539

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI