Global Patent Index - EP 0930396 A3

EP 0930396 A3 2000-05-03 - Process and apparatus for applying a liquid or a pasty product onto a moving web

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for applying a liquid or a pasty product onto a moving web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auftrag eines flüssigen bis pastösen Auftragsmediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour appliquer un liquide ou un produit pâteux sur une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 0930396 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123138 A

Priority

DE 19801140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930396A2] For the direct or indirect application of a liquid or paste coating medium to the surface of a moving web (14), of paper or cardboard, deviations at the applicator (10) are corrected during the coating operation. One operating parameter is taken for the applicator (10) at the moving web (14), with a parameter measurement used which is taken shortly before detection of the deviation from the set parameter value. A correction to return the working to the required parameter level is applied momentarily, and repeated if necessary. The operating parameter, after its adjustment, is set back to the start value according to the establishment of at least the smallest deviations or independently of it. Or the operating parameter is returned to the start value after a given time lapse from the resetting. The coating quality on the web (14) is checked for faulty coating zones, to determine whether the number of faulty zones is acceptable or not. The coating on the web (14) is scanned visually by an operative, or optically by an optical scanner (86) for the measured scanning data to be evaluated for the presence of faulty coating zones. The optical scanner (86) registers the opacity of or the reflection from the coated web (14). The measured data are evaluated and displayed, for the operative to make a decision on any coating corrective action. The measured data are evaluated and processed pref. with a microprocessor (94), to inform the operative of the level of detected coating faults in relation to an acceptable count, and the action to be taken to correct at least one operating parameter. On detection of coating faults, the operative is given an optical and/or acoustic alarm warning. The microprocessor (94) can be connected to a control (100), which corrects at least one operating parameter to restore the web coating quality. The applicator (10) is a free jet system with a jet stream (16) of the coating medium delivered from the jet opening (12) to the web (14) surface in a direct coating application. For an indirect coating action, the coating medium is spread over a moving transfer surface to be transferred to the web (14). The parameter for correction of the coating quality, on a direct coating action, uses the jet stream characteristics and especially the shape of the jet stream. The parameter correction is applied by increasing the cross section of the jet opening (12), and then decreasing it. The increase in the jet opening (12) size is across the direction (18) of web (14) or transfer surface movement, locally where coating quality deviations have been registered, or the increase is over the whole jet opening length. An Independent claim is included for a web coating station with an applicator (10) to spread the coating medium over the web (14) surface. A monitor (86) registers the coating quality, and is linked to a microprocessor (94) to evaluate the measured data. The evaluation unit (94) is linked to an alarm system (96,98).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 23/78 (2006.01); D21H 23/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/78 (2013.01); D21H 23/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801140 A1 19990715; EP 0930396 A2 19990721; EP 0930396 A3 20000503; JP H11253864 A 19990921; US 6171642 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI