Global Patent Index - EP 0930399 A3

EP 0930399 A3 2000-06-07 - Set of shaped bricks

Title (en)

Set of shaped bricks

Title (de)

Formstein-Bausatz

Title (fr)

Jeu de briques profilées

Publication

EP 0930399 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100549 A

Priority

  • DE 19801621 A
  • DE 19816007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930399A2] The concrete paving stone set has paving stones (G,L) especially for laying on curved lines. The paving stones are in sizes with a constant length difference (X) of 2-6 mm, to allow for the different radii at the outside and inside of a curved laying. The stones are formed as short lengths (G1,K1), long lengths (G2,K2) and extension lengths (G3,K3), for laying curved paths of different lengths and curvatures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/06 (2013.01); E01C 2201/02 (2013.01); E01C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930399 A2 19990721; EP 0930399 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI