Global Patent Index - EP 0930401 B1

EP 0930401 B1 2002-11-20 - Excavator bucket

Title (en)

Excavator bucket

Title (de)

Baggerlöffel

Title (fr)

Godet d'excavateur

Publication

EP 0930401 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123548 A

Priority

DE 19801938 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930401A2] The excavator bucket (10), for a trench excavator (20), has a scraper box (12) with a second upper scraper opening (42) away from the ground base, to take out a trench edge strip (24). The outline of the second scraper opening (42) has a free end edge as a cutter. An end wall has a wide side edging, opposite the first scraper opening (36) of the scraper box (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/40; E02F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/40 (2006.01); E02F 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/40 (2013.01); E02F 9/2883 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930401 A2 19990721; EP 0930401 A3 20000621; EP 0930401 B1 20021120; AT 228191 T 20021215; DE 19801938 A1 19990722; DK 0930401 T3 20030317

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HOLP G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2004-12-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806349 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228191 T 20021215

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOLP GMBH

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02F 3/40 A, 7E 02F 5/02 B

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI