Global Patent Index - EP 0930406 A3

EP 0930406 A3 2000-02-23 - Sub-floor

Title (en)

Sub-floor

Title (de)

Unterboden

Title (fr)

Sous-sol

Publication

EP 0930406 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100663 A

Priority

AT 5198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930406A2] The flooring arrangement has a barrier layer (4) of vapor-permeable materials and liquids forming a reinforcement layer (22), such as of knitted fibers and filaments, with a non woven layer (5), yarn layer, of woven fabrics, or paper, etc. The barrier layer (4) and the flooring (6) are bonded together through a transit layer (21). The pore size of the fiber mesh and filaments in the barrier layer (4) is smaller than the mean particle size of the concrete to be hardened as the flooring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/12; E04B 1/70; F24D 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930406 A2 19990721; EP 0930406 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-11-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000822;SI PAYMENT 20000822

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04F 15/12 A, 7E 04B 1/70 B, 7F 24D 3/14 B

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI