Global Patent Index - EP 0930426 A3

EP 0930426 A3 2000-11-08 - Method for pre-setting the reference pressure for an accumulator fuel injection system

Title (en)

Method for pre-setting the reference pressure for an accumulator fuel injection system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vorgabe des Einspritzdruck-Sollwertes bei Speichereinspritzsystemen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour prédéterminer la référence de pression d'un système d'injection de carburant avec accumulateur

Publication

EP 0930426 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124810 A

Priority

DE 19800940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930426A2] The method involves setting the pressure in the rail (18) depending on the operating states of the engine by specifying the demand pressure. Characteristic fields (10,301,302) are used for the injection pressure base value (FUPSPPLBAS) under load, during engine start-up (FUPSPST) and during idling (FUPSPIS). The output of the load-mode characteristic field is applied to the input of a first differential time element (204), whose time characteristic depends on the engine speed. The output of the first time element, the characteristic fields for the start and idle modes and the output of a characteristic field (402) for setting a base time constant are applied to the input of a second time element (401), whose output delivers the injection pressure desired value (FUPSP) for each engine operating state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/2422 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 41/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1432 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2200/606 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930426 A2 19990721; EP 0930426 A3 20001108; EP 0930426 B1 20031203; US 6035829 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810332

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091229

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091229

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091229

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810332 P 20040115

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI