Global Patent Index - EP 0930431 A3

EP 0930431 A3 2000-05-03 - Intake system for an internal combustion engine with at least two cylinders

Title (en)

Intake system for an internal combustion engine with at least two cylinders

Title (de)

Einlasssystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit wenigstens zwei Zylindern

Title (fr)

Système d'admission pour moteur à combustion interne à au moins deux cylindres

Publication

EP 0930431 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100656 A

Priority

JP 548498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930431A2] An internal combustion engine has throttle valves installed, each of its air intake passages connecting a surge tank with each of the cylinders. An inter-cylindrical connecting passage is formed near the air intake valves between adjacent air intake passages. An auxiliary air intake passage branches from the surge tank to bypass the throttle valve and connects to the inter-cylindrical connecting passage. An idle speed control valve is installed in the auxiliary air intake passage. Thus, stabilized combustion of the air/fuel mixture even during the low to mid-load operating ranges can be obtained to improve fuel economy and reduce NOX emissions. The invention is of particular advantage in engines using exhaust gas recirculation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/104

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 31/00 (2006.01); F02B 31/02 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F02D 9/1055 (2013.01); F02M 26/01 (2016.02); F02M 26/20 (2016.02); F02M 26/36 (2016.02); F02M 35/10045 (2013.01); F02M 35/10072 (2013.01); F02M 35/10111 (2013.01); F02M 35/10222 (2013.01); F02M 35/10308 (2013.01); F02B 2031/003 (2013.01); F02B 2031/006 (2013.01); F02D 9/1095 (2013.01); F02M 2026/009 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930431 A2 19990721; EP 0930431 A3 20000503; EP 0930431 B1 20040908; DE 69919916 D1 20041014; DE 69919916 T2 20050120; JP 3916313 B2 20070516; JP H11200869 A 19990727; PL 193890 B1 20070330; PL 330836 A1 19990719

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090114

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-12-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041219

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919916 P 20041014

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI