Global Patent Index - EP 0930460 A3

EP 0930460 A3 2001-01-10 - Lamp socket and cable arrangement

Title (en)

Lamp socket and cable arrangement

Title (de)

Lampenfassung- und Kabel-Anordnung

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe et arrangement de câble

Publication

EP 0930460 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107218 A

Priority

  • DE 29800637 U
  • GB 9726809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2332570A] A lamp socket and electric wire arrangement which includes a lamp socket (10) holding a bulb (20), a socket cap (30) fastened to the lamp socket (10) at a bottom side, an electric wire (40) retained between the lamp socket (10) and the socket cap (30), and a shell (90) molded on the socket cap (30) and the lamp socket (10) over the electric wire (40), wherein the lamp socket (10) has two downward coupling plates (17;18) raised from a bottom side thereof, a wire mounting space (19) defined between the downward coupling plates (17;18) which receives the electric wire (40), and two hooked portions (171;181) respectively raised from the downward coupling plates (17;18) at an outer side; the socket cap (30) has two upright coupling plates (31;32) raised from two opposite sides thereof and respectively attached the downward coupling plates (17;18) at an outer side, the upright coupling plates (31;32) of the socket cap (30) having a respective hook hole (33;34) respectively forced into engagement with the hooked portions (171;181) on the downward coupling plates (17;18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/00; F21P 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/002 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/22 (2006.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/22 (2013.01); F21V 19/00 (2013.01); F21V 21/002 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01); H01R 4/2404 (2013.01); H01R 12/67 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29800637 U1 19980319; EP 0930460 A2 19990721; EP 0930460 A3 20010110; GB 2332570 A9; GB 2332570 A 19990623; GB 9726809 D0 19980218

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031104

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI