Global Patent Index - EP 0930462 A3

EP 0930462 A3 2000-01-12 - Flame tube for burner

Title (en)

Flame tube for burner

Title (de)

Flammrohrausbildung für Brenner

Title (fr)

Tube de flammes pour brûleur

Publication

EP 0930462 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122959 A

Priority

DE 19801224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930462A2] The mixer (8) through which primary air (11) flows is positioned after the burner jet (2), and secondary air flows axially through the outer periphery. A fire pipe (16) is enclosed by a pipe element (27) to form an annular chamber (26) open on the burner side, and conveys and discharges extra secondary air via passages (17) into the fire pipe. The annular chamber has a sleeve-shaped partition (30) joined to the bottom, to form an outer annular chamber (32) and inner annular compartment (31), to feed secondary air via passages (12) into the fire pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/06; F23D 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/06 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/40 (2013.01); F23C 7/06 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11403 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930462 A2 19990721; EP 0930462 A3 20000112; DE 19801224 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK LI

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK LI

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI