Global Patent Index - EP 0930479 A3

EP 0930479 A3 2000-07-05 - Method for the connection of pipes and device for carrying out the same

Title (en)

Method for the connection of pipes and device for carrying out the same

Title (de)

Rohrverbindungsverfahren und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le raccordement de tuyaux et dispositif pour sa mise an oeuvre

Publication

EP 0930479 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100560 A

Priority

DE 19800910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930479A2] The tube connecting process provides a temporary connection between a tube and the boring of a plate. The tube is fixed with the end freely projecting. The plate is mounted on the tube by its boring. Sectors of the tube end are widened radially while stamping the material of tube and plate and the tube outer surface and inner wall of the boring in the plate. An Independent claim is also included for the device used for the tube connecting process including a fixing device (4) and a clamping device (6), between which the end of the tube (1) and the plate (3) are fixed. A tool holder (17) can move the tube end axially.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/16; B21D 24/10; B21D 39/06; F16L 23/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800910 A1 19990715; AT 237114 T 20030415; EP 0930479 A2 19990721; EP 0930479 A3 20000705; EP 0930479 B1 20030409

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-03-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-01-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-04-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001230

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE CONNECTION OF PIPES AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE SAME

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI