Global Patent Index - EP 0930594 A3

EP 0930594 A3 2000-07-19 - Receiver for digital coded messages

Title (en)

Receiver for digital coded messages

Title (de)

Empfänger für digital codierte Meldungen

Title (fr)

Récepteur de messages codés en numérique

Publication

EP 0930594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123274 A

Priority

DE 19801010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930594A2] The receiver has a memory for the received messages and devices for decoding and managing the received messages, whereby a location table is required for each source for decoding. The receiver contains a changeover device (20) for switching between information sources. Before switching over to another information source the device checks that its associated location table is available.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 20/93 (2008.01); H04H 60/51 (2008.01); H04H 60/91 (2008.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/094 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 20/93 (2013.01); H04H 60/51 (2013.01); H04H 60/91 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801010 A1 19990715; EP 0930594 A2 19990721; EP 0930594 A3 20000719; EP 0930594 B1 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151207

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060202

2004-06-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HARMAN/BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808980 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RECEIVER FOR DIGITAL CODED MESSAGES AND METHOD

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI