Global Patent Index - EP 0930597 B1

EP 0930597 B1 2007-10-03 - Adhesive film

Title (en)

Adhesive film

Title (de)

Adhäsionsfolie

Title (fr)

Pellicule d'adhesion

Publication

EP 0930597 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124740 A

Priority

DE 29800178 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930597A2] The pocket (14) at least on a part of its periphery is open. Practically over the whole length of one long side and/or over at least the half of its peripheral length, the pocket is open. It is also open over practically the complete length of its narrow side. The pocket has a closure of adhesive foil, which adheres in a closed manner to the rear side of the adhesion foil (10). The adhesion foil and/or the sheet material (12) are/is of transparent material. The adhesion foil as layer material is provided with sheet material-side support layer (16) of polyester foil preventing softening.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01); G09F 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/203 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930597 A2 19990721; EP 0930597 A3 19991215; EP 0930597 B1 20071003; AT 374989 T 20071015; DE 59814103 D1 20071115; ES 2293671 T3 20080316

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-27 [PRVN] PETITION FOR REVIEW BY THE ENLARGED BOARD OF APPEAL NOT GRANTED

- Free text: PETITION FOR REVIEW OBVIOUSLY UNSUBSTANTIATED

- Effective date: 20151215

2015-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 374989 T

- Effective date: 20141228

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20071003

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20071003

2015-01-22 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 59814103

- Effective date: 20150122

2014-12-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-12-03 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-11-14 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140606

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140616

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-03 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59814103

2014-07-03 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59814103

2011-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FA. FRANZ HROCH

- Effective date: 20080630

2011-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AHB-AUTOHANDEL-BEDARF GMBH

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071003

2008-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FA. FRANZ HROCH

2008-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AHB-AUTOHANDEL-BEDARF GMBH

2008-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FA. FRANZ HROCH

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AHB-AUTOHANDEL-BEDARF GMBH

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-06-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2293671 T3

2008-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071219

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814103 P 20071115

2007-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ADHESIVE FILM

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020909

2000-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6G 09F 3/20 A, 6G 09F 7/12 B

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VISI/ONE GMBH

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI