Global Patent Index - EP 0930631 A3

EP 0930631 A3 2000-10-25 - Thermal switching device

Title (en)

Thermal switching device

Title (de)

Thermisches Schaltelement

Title (fr)

Elément de commutation thermique

Publication

EP 0930631 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100683 A

Priority

DE 19801251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0930631A2] The switch element (1) has a housing (4) containing a bimetallic strip (6) on a heat conducting plate (5). The edge region of the bimetallic strip is such that the strip bends in one direction when the temperature if above a spring temperature and bends in the opposite direction when the temperature is below the spring temperature. The direction is bending effects the contact path between the fixed and movable contacts. A spreading element ensures that the bimetallic strip contacts the heat conducting plate. The spreading element is in the form of a ring (8) with at least one radially inwardly extending tongues (9,10). The ring lies on the bimetallic strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/54 (2013.01); H01H 2037/5454 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0930631 A2 19990721; EP 0930631 A3 20001025; DE 19801251 A1 19990729; DE 19801251 C2 20020124

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010423

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI