Global patent index - EP 0930931 A4

EP 0930931 A4 2000-07-12 - MODULAR FILTRATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

MODULAR FILTRATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

MODULARES FILTERSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FILTRATION MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 0930931 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97940671 A

Priority

  • US 9715181 W
  • US 70824996 A
  • US 72286896 A
  • US 3334296 P
  • US 3334396 P
  • US 3286396 P
  • US 3673997 P
  • US 3674097 P
  • US 83491697 A
  • US 4300197 P
  • US 4418997 P
  • US 5119297 P
  • US 5122397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9809718A1] The weight of a fluid is used to drive a plurality of semi-permeable membranes or other filter material to produce a permeate, and in at least some level of the apparatus more than 30 % of the permeate produced is collected within a single casing (32). In other aspects, the filter material is at least partially contained within series production modules (40), which may contain transport zones for transporting feed or flushing fluid. In other aspects the ends of adjacent production modules may be designated to mate with one another using a slip fit, and the production modules may be maintained in matting relationship through connections to supporting cables or rods (23). In other aspects of the inventive subject matter a submerged pump (53) may be used to raise permeate towards the surface, and the pump may advantageously operate at least partially using centrifugal force and/or air lift principles. In still other aspects feed fluid can be provided from salty or brackish water source such as an ocean or bay using pipes having removable inlet plugs which resist clogging, and it is contemplated that such pipes can be laid using an underwater sled which digs a trench while concurrently laying the pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 61/02; B01D 61/10; B01D 63/12; B01D 63/14; B01D 65/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/44 (2006.01); B01D 61/02 (2006.01); B01D 61/06 (2006.01); B01D 61/08 (2006.01); B01D 61/10 (2006.01); B01D 63/00 (2006.01); B01D 63/12 (2006.01); B01D 63/14 (2006.01); B01D 65/06 (2006.01); B01D 65/08 (2006.01); C02F 3/00 (2006.01); C02F 3/12 (2006.01); F04D 13/12 (2006.01); F16L 9/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 9/006 (2013.01); B01D 61/022 (2013.01); B01D 61/06 (2013.01); B01D 61/08 (2013.01); B01D 61/10 (2013.01); B01D 63/12 (2013.01); B01D 63/14 (2013.01); B01D 65/02 (2013.01); B01D 65/08 (2013.01); F04D 13/12 (2013.01); B01D 2321/02 (2013.01); C02F 1/441 (2013.01); C02F 1/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9809718A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9809718 A1 19980312; AU 4239397 A 19980326; AU 717474 B2 20000330; CA 2264853 A1 19980312; CA 2264853 C 20030805; CN 1233972 A 19991103; EP 0930931 A1 19990728; EP 0930931 A4 20000712; IL 128621 A 20020210; IL 128621 D0 20000131; JP 2002504012 A 20020205; JP 3522768 B2 20040426; KR 100422891 B1 20040312; KR 20010029459 A 20010406; KR 20010106362 A 20011129; MX 212477 B 20030109; MX 9901941 A 20000301; NO 991014 A 19990430; NO 991014 D0 19990302

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1019412

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2009-08-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20090217

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030805

2000-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01D 61/02 A, 7B 01D 61/10 B, 7B 01D 63/12 B, 7B 01D 63/14 B, 7B 01D 65/08 B

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE