Global Patent Index - EP 0930971 B1

EP 0930971 B1 2000-04-26 - PAPER FEEDING IN A FOLDER

Title (en)

PAPER FEEDING IN A FOLDER

Title (de)

PAPIERBAHNZUFÜHRUNG ZU FALZAPPARATEN

Title (fr)

ALIMENTATION D'APPAREILS DE PLIAGE EN FEUILLE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 0930971 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945745 A

Priority

  • DE 9702340 W
  • DE 19642420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6193640B1] Folders in a web-fed rotary printing press are associated with two spaced horizontal planes. Each of these planes is provided with a superstructure carriage that supports a plurality of turning bars. Each of the superstructure carriages can be displaced horizontally with respect to the other carriage and with respect to the folders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/58; B41F 13/06; B65H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/58 (2006.01); B41F 13/54 (2006.01); B65H 23/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6193640 B1 20010227; EP 0930971 A1 19990728; EP 0930971 B1 20000426; JP 2000503963 A 20000404; JP 3519087 B2 20040412; WO 9816386 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701534 20010517

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990929

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI