Global patent index - EP 0930993 B1

EP 0930993 B1 2000-04-05 - MARINE MOORING SYSTEM

Title (en)

MARINE MOORING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR VERTÄUUNG VON SCHIFFEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AMARRAGE EN MER

Publication

EP 0930993 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97944032 A

Priority

  • GB 9702752 W
  • GB 9621031 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815449A1] Mooring apparatus, and method of use thereof, for marine vessels, comprising a subsea anchor (12) such as a suction pile (14), and including a swivel (16) to which at least one mooring line (24) is connected, the other end of the mooring line being adapted for connection to the bow mooring apparatus of a marine vessel (22) such as a conventional tanker. The mooring line (24) includes a load cell for measuring tension applied to the line by reverse thrust of the vessel. Signals from the load cell are transmitted from the bow of the vessel to the bridge (40), enabling manual, automatic or semi-automatic control of the applied tension. In use, the mooring line is maintained under tension such that the vessel may weathervane around the swivel. The system may be employed as part of a subsea fluid product export system for offloading the product to a tanker moored using the system, employing a flexible riser (20) having its lower end connected to a subsea product source and its upper end connected to the fluid manifold of the tanker via a floating hose assembly (34). The system is also useful in other applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2013.01); B63B 2021/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815449 A1 19980416; AU 4567697 A 19980505; BR 9711888 A 19990921; EP 0930993 A1 19990728; EP 0930993 B1 20000405; GB 9621031 D0 19961127; NO 319918 B1 20051003; NO 991664 A 19990408; NO 991664 D0 19990408; US 6082283 A 20000704; ZA 9709050 B 19980824

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101008

2011-08-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IE

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990726

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990224

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IE