Global Patent Index - EP 0930997 B1

EP 0930997 B1 2000-08-09 - CABLE BINDING TOOL

Title (en)

CABLE BINDING TOOL

Title (de)

KABELBINDEWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL POUR LA FIXATION D'UN CABLE

Publication

EP 0930997 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97911200 A

Priority

  • DE 29617650 U
  • EP 9705546 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6119734A] PCT No. PCT/EP97/05546 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 8, 1999 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 8, 1999 PCT Filed Oct. 8, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO98/15458 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 16, 1998A cable binding tool for binding a belt around an object employs a novel arrangement of support rollers on an adjustably spring loaded abutment to urge the belt against a toothed tightening wheel. The tightening wheel is continuously driven during the tightening operation, continuing to rotate with respect to the belt even after the desired belt tension has been achieved. The arrangement of support rollers takes advantage of the stiffness of the belt to equalize the force acting per unit length between the belt and the tightening roller over that portion of the circumference of the tightening roller in contact with the belt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617650 U1 19980205; EP 0930997 A1 19990728; EP 0930997 B1 20000809; ES 2150230 T3 20001116; JP 2001501563 A 20010206; JP 3756196 B2 20060315; PT 930997 E 20001229; US 6119734 A 20000919; WO 9815458 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150230

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702159

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLERMANN TYTON GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLERMANN TYTON GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991012

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990406

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE