Global patent index - EP 0931001 B1

EP 0931001 B1 2000-06-28 - SCREW-TYPE CAP WITH SAFETY AND GUARANTEE BAND

Title (en)

SCREW-TYPE CAP WITH SAFETY AND GUARANTEE BAND

Title (de)

SCHRAUBVERSCHLUSS MIT EINEM SICHERHEITS- UND GARANTIEBAND

Title (fr)

FERMETURE VISSEE A BANDE DE SECURITE ET DE GARANTIE

Publication

EP 0931001 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941777 A

Priority

  • CH 9700377 W
  • CH 244896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815465A1] A safety band (3) of a sealing unit (1) has two retaining noses (12a, 12b; 13a, 13b) arranged in diagonally facing pairs. The retaining noses (12a, 12b; 13a, 13b) standing out on the clear opening of the safety band (3) are axially displaced. When the bottle (17) is closed, the pair of retaining noses (12a, 12b) is first split and then glides on the retaining rib (15). After that the retaining noses (13a, 13b) that are displaced 90 DEG are split and also glide beneath the retaining rib (15). When the bottle is opened the retaining noses (13a, 13b) are first retained on the retaining rib (15) and the connecting webs (9) to the screw-type cap (2) are broken. Afterwards, the remaining webs (9) are also broken once the axially offset retaining noses (12a, 12b) are obstructed by the retaining rib (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/3447 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0046 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815465 A1 19980416; AT 194121 T 20000715; AU 4374697 A 19980505; AU 721558 B2 20000706; BR 9711889 A 20000118; CA 2267787 A1 19980416; CA 2267787 C 20070515; CN 1091731 C 20021002; CN 1231641 A 19991013; CZ 291896 B6 20030618; CZ 9901190 A3 20001115; DE 19781083 D2 20000615; DE 59701954 D1 20000803; EP 0931001 A1 19990728; EP 0931001 B1 20000628; ES 2149612 T3 20001101; GR 3034456 T3 20001229; HK 1021169 A1 20030530; IL 129371 D0 20000217; KR 20000048996 A 20000725; PL 191811 B1 20060731; PL 332600 A1 19990927; PT 931001 E 20001130; SK 283598 B6 20031007; SK 44499 A3 20030701; TR 9900805 T2 19990721

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121008

2014-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140116

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130408

2013-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-08-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701954

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-07-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20000402148

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 194121

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-05-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CORVAGLIA PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-04-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130408

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111017

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111007

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149612

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HANS PETER MEIER PATENTANWALT

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701954

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194121

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991012

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT