Global patent index - EP 0931005 B1

EP 0931005 B1 2000-07-26 - CONTAINER FOR POLLUTED AND/OR CONTAMINATED MATERIALS

Title (en)

CONTAINER FOR POLLUTED AND/OR CONTAMINATED MATERIALS

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER FÜR VERSCHMUTZTE UND/ODER KONTAMINIERTE MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR POUR MATERIAUX POLLUES ET/OU CONTAMINES

Publication

EP 0931005 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96932420 A

Priority

CH 9600359 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9816446A1] Device for storing polluted and/or contaminated materials (14), comprising a container (1) which can be closed by at least one swivelling, opening cover (2) and a drive mechanism enabling said cover to be opened temporarily. A proximity sensor (50) located in cover opening area controls an electric motor (22) which actuates a rocking lever via a control cable (25, 26, 29) in such a way that the rocking lever swings into rest position by virtue of the cover's own weight and the wound cable (26) rolls off onto a roller (25) placed on the axis of the electric motor and shuts the cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16; B65F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/00 (2006.01); B65F 1/14 (2006.01); B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/141 (2013.01); B65F 1/1638 (2013.01); B65F 2210/172 (2013.01); B65F 2240/164 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9816446 A1 19980423; AT 194960 T 20000815; AU 7123996 A 19980511; CA 2266772 A1 19980423; CA 2266772 C 20050920; CZ 293697 B6 20040714; CZ 9901226 A3 20000315; DE 59605664 D1 20000831; DK 0931005 T3 20001106; EP 0931005 A1 19990728; EP 0931005 B1 20000726; ES 2149497 T3 20001101; HK 1018607 A1 20001229; HR P970542 A2 19980630; HR P970542 B1 20010831; JP 2001504073 A 20010327; JP 3828579 B2 20061004; KR 100423949 B1 20040322; KR 20000049098 A 20000725; MY 119337 A 20050531; PT 931005 E 20001229; SK 283931 B6 20040504; SK 46399 A3 20000313; US 6211637 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 194960

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20161011

2016-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161010

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-10-17 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20161011

2016-10-12 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20161010

2016-10-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CWS INTERNATIONAL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-07-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-19 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149497

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-31

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194960

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990914

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990403

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE