Global Patent Index - EP 0931091 A4

EP 0931091 A4 2000-06-14 - INHIBITORS OF PLA 2

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF PLA 2

Title (de)

PLA 2 INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DES PLA 2

Publication

EP 0931091 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97941734 A

Priority

  • AU 9700648 W
  • AU PO266096 A
  • AU PO266196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813376A1] The present invention relates to a three-dimensional structure which inhibits the activity of PLA2. In one particular aspect the structure has a conformation and polarity such that it binds to (i) at least one amino acid in the N-terminal helix region of PLA2; and/or (ii) at least one amino acid in the region spanning residues (70-77) of PLA2. In another aspect the structure is a peptide comprising D-amino acids which has a sequence corresponding to the reverse sequence of a region between residues (69 and 75) of PLA2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 7/04; A61K 38/08; A61K 38/12; C07K 7/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/99 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 7/04 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 7/06 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9301215 A1 19930121 - GARVAN INST MED RES [AU]
  • [PX] A TSENG ET AL.: "Native peptide inhibition", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., vol. 271, no. 39, 27 September 1996 (1996-09-27), AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD., US, pages 23992 - 23998, XP002135015, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • See also references of WO 9813376A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813376 A1 19980402; CA 2266746 A1 19980402; EP 0931091 A1 19990728; EP 0931091 A4 20000614; JP 2001501199 A 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2000-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990422

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE