Global Patent Index - EP 0931172 B1

EP 0931172 B1 2001-12-12 - COATED WEAR RESISTING PISTON RINGS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION

Title (en)

COATED WEAR RESISTING PISTON RINGS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION

Title (de)

VERSCHLEISSFESTE, BESCHICHTETE KOLBENRINGE, KOLBENRINGE FÜR VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SEGMENTS DE PISTON REVETUS RESISTANTS A L'USURE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0931172 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97912019 A

Priority

  • DE 9702205 W
  • DE 19640789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19640789A1] The invention relates to coated wear resisting parts for internal combustion engines, specially piston rings, and the method for their production. The parts disclosed in the invention are specially advantageous when used in modern designed motors. According to the invention, said wear resisting parts are characterized by a 50 to 400 mu m thick coating applied by thermal spraying on the surface of the part subjected to wear. The coating is characterized by the fact that several cubic hard material phases containing Ti and C and/or Ti and a second metal and carbon, and a metal binder phase can be demonstrated. According to the invention, said parts are produced by applying the coating using plasma spraying on air or high speed flame spraying.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/06; F02F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 5/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/06 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19640789 A1 19980416; DE 19640789 C2 20020131; AU 4940297 A 19980424; BR 9711841 A 20000118; EP 0931172 A1 19990728; EP 0931172 B1 20011212; ES 2168618 T3 20020616; JP 2001503816 A 20010321; PT 931172 E 20020628; WO 9814628 A1 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050926

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050925

2006-05-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-03-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-09-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-09-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2005-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2004-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040903

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168618 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705801 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 4/06 A, 7F 02F 5/00 B

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COATED WEAR RESISTING PISTON RINGS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990428

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE