Global Patent Index - EP 0931179 B1

EP 0931179 B1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR PHOSPHATING A STEEL BAND

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PHOSPHATING A STEEL BAND

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PHOSPHATIERUNG VON STAHLBAND

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA PHOSPHATATION D'UN FEUILLARD D'ACIER

Publication

EP 0931179 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942941 A

Priority

  • DE 19639596 A
  • EP 9705091 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19639596A1] The invention concerns a method for phosphating a steel band or a steel band galvanized or alloy-coated on one side or both sides by spraying or dipping for a period ranging from 2 to 15 seconds using an acid, zinc and manganese-containing phosphating solution at a temperature ranging from 40 to 70 DEG C. Said method is characterized by a phosphating solution containing 1 to 4 g/l zinc ions, 0.8 to 3.5 g/l manganese ions, 10 to 30 g/l phosphate ions, 0.1 to 3 g/l free, ionic or bound hydroxylamine, and no more than 1 g/l nitrate ions, a free acid content ranging from 0.4 to 4 points and a total acid content ranging from 12 to 50 points. The phosphating solution contains optionally 0.8 to 3.5 g/l nickel or 0.002 to 0.2 g/l copper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/12 (2006.01); C23C 22/18 (2006.01); C23C 22/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/182 (2013.01); C23C 22/184 (2013.01); C23C 22/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19639596 A1 19980402; AT 197969 T 20001215; AU 4459397 A 19980417; CA 2266625 A1 19980402; CN 1231706 A 19991013; EP 0931179 A2 19990728; EP 0931179 B1 20001206; ES 2153217 T3 20010216; ID 21474 A 19990617; JP 2001508123 A 20010619; KR 20000048509 A 20000725; WO 9813534 A2 19980402; WO 9813534 A3 19980827

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010917

2002-05-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20010930

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-09-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-09-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-09-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153217 T3

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702741 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197969 T 20001215

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990317

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE