Global Patent Index - EP 0931182 B1

EP 0931182 B1 2001-12-05 - ULTRASTABLE ANODES FOR ALUMINUM PRODUCTION CELLS

Title (en)

ULTRASTABLE ANODES FOR ALUMINUM PRODUCTION CELLS

Title (de)

ANODEN MIT HOHER STABILITÄT FÜR ALUMINIUMPRODUKTIONSZELLEN

Title (fr)

ANODES ULTRASTABLES POUR CELLULES DE PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 0931182 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942654 A

Priority

  • US 9716865 W
  • US 9615176 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812363A1] An anode for the electrowinning of aluminum by the electrolysis of alumina dissolved in a molten fluoride electrolyte comprises a porous micropyretic reaction product of nickel, aluminum, iron, copper and at least one additive element selected from silicon, tin, zinc, vanadium, indium, hafnium, tungsten, elements from the lanthanide series starting from praesodymium, and misch metal. The micropyretic reaction product contains metallic and intermetallic phases, with a composite oxide surface produced in-situ by anodic polarization of the porous micropyretic reaction product in a molten fluoride electrolyte containing dissolved alumina, or by high temperature treatment in an oxidizing gas. The composite oxide surface usually comprises an iron-rich relatively dense outer portion and an aluminate-rich relatively porous inner portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/12; C22C 1/04; C25C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/23 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C25C 3/06 (2006.01); C25C 3/12 (2006.01); C25C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/23 (2013.01); C22C 1/0491 (2013.01); C25C 3/06 (2013.01); C25C 3/12 (2013.01); C25C 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812363 A1 19980326; CA 2269727 A1 19980326; DE 69708903 D1 20020117; DE 69708903 T2 20020627; EP 0931182 A1 19990728; EP 0931182 B1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020923

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708903 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990823

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL