Global Patent Index - EP 0931188 B1

EP 0931188 B1 2001-05-02 - FILAMENT SPOOL OR DOFF HANDLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

FILAMENT SPOOL OR DOFF HANDLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

HANDHABUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FILAMENTSPULEN ODER DOFFS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MANIPULATION POUR BOBINES DE FILAMENTS OU LEVEES

Publication

EP 0931188 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97950131 A

Priority

  • DE 29620792 U
  • EP 9706160 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824952A1] The invention relates to a handling system (1) for filament spools (4) or doffs (5) in a spinning installation, which has a spinning area (2) and a storage area (12). The handling system (1) comprises a conveyor device (16), a separating device (17) and a delivery station (11). The conveyor device (6) and the delivery station (11) have multiple recesses (7) for several doffs (5). The delivery station (11) is located between the conveyor device (6) and the separating device (17) on the edge of or outside the spinning area (2). The separating device (17) is placed in or on the storage area (12). Hence, separation of the filament spools (4) occurs outside the spinning area (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/18; B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/18 (2013.01); B65H 67/064 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29620792 U1 19980402; EP 0931188 A1 19990728; EP 0931188 B1 20010502; US 6250059 B1 20010626; WO 9824952 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081106

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703478 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT