Global Patent Index - EP 0931198 B1

EP 0931198 B1 2001-12-19 - JET ADJUSTER

Title (en)

JET ADJUSTER

Title (de)

STRAHLREGLER

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR DE JET

Publication

EP 0931198 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97910434 A

Priority

  • DE 29617719 U
  • EP 9705595 W
  • EP 9701221 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9816694A1] The invention relates to a jet adjuster (80) comprising a jet decomposition device (9) and a jet adjustment device (1) located at a distance downstream in the direction of flow, forming the tail end of the jet adjuster (80) on the outflow side with a plurality of through openings (3). The inventive jet adjuster (80) is characterized by the fact that the jet adjustment device (1) has a perforated plate (2) on the outflow side comprising several through openings (3) at least partially in the area embodied as a field of perforations on the plane perpendicular to the direction of flow. Guiding walls (4) separating adjacent through openings from each other extend approximately in the direction of flow and have a wall thickness amounting to a fraction of the inner diameter of a through opening (3) bounded by guiding walls (4) so that the ratio h/D between the height (h) of guiding walls (4) and total diameter (D) of jet adjustment device is less than 1. Inventive jet adjuster is characterized by a particularly good jet formation and a high degree of functional reliability. It is also relatively easy to produce.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/08; E03C 1/084

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/084 (2006.01); E03C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/084 (2013.01); E03C 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9816694 A1 19980423; AT 211206 T 20020115; AU 1926797 A 19980511; AU 4781697 A 19980511; AU 713927 B2 19991216; BR 9713257 A 19991103; DE 29704286 U1 19970430; DE 29718727 U1 19971120; DE 59705910 D1 20020131; DK 0931198 T3 20020415; EP 0931198 A1 19990728; EP 0931198 B1 20011219; ES 2170369 T3 20020801; JP 2001502026 A 20010213; JP 3975241 B2 20070912; KR 100523050 B1 20051021; KR 20000049069 A 20000725; US 6126093 A 20001003; WO 9816693 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 211206 T

- Effective date: 20171010

2017-10-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705910

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161010

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161010

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-22 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: NEOPERL GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 211206 T

- Effective date: 20120427

2011-10-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: NEOPERL GMBH

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NEOPERL GMBH

- Free text: DIETER WILDFANG GMBH#KLOSTERRUNSSTRASSE 11#D-79379 MUELLHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NEOPERL GMBH#KLOSTERRUNSSTRASSE 11#79379 MUELLHEIM (DE)

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DIETER *WILDFANG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-08-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170369 T3

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-03-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705910 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211206 T 20020115

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

1999-08-25 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE