Global Patent Index - EP 0931201 B1

EP 0931201 B1 2000-04-19 - DEVICE FOR SECURING SHUTTERING PANELS IN A CONCRETE DISPOSABLE PATTERN

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SECURING SHUTTERING PANELS IN A CONCRETE DISPOSABLE PATTERN

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE SCHALUNGSPLATTEN EINER VERLORENEN BETONSCHALUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FIXATION DE PANNEAUX DE COFFRAGE POUR UN MOULE PERDU EN BETON

Publication

EP 0931201 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944831 A

Priority

  • DE 29617776 U
  • EP 9704819 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9816700A1] The present invention relates to a securing system comprising a first fixing device (14) consisting of a V-bent metal sheet and a second fixing element (15), also consisting of a V-bent metal sheet. The second fixing member (15) is placed crosswise to the first one (14), in a recess (22) provided thereon (14); then, a rod-shaped holding member (33) is pushed through an opening (32) provided in the second fixing device (15). The holding member (33) engages below the top face (18) of the first fixing element (14), thereby interlocking both fixing elements (14, 15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/8635 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29617776 U1 19961128; AT 191946 T 20000515; CZ 9901238 A3 19991013; EP 0931201 A1 19990728; EP 0931201 B1 20000419; SK 34899 A3 20000313; WO 9816700 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060905

2005-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: D.E.E.D. A.S.

- Free text: KEWO HOLDING GMBH#TRIERER STRASSE 1-7#53937 SCHLEIDEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- D.E.E.D. A.S.#DVORSKSS 238#503 11 HRADEC KRSSLOVE (CZ)

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701486 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-04-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191946 T 20000515

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990813

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI