Global Patent Index - EP 0931211 B1

EP 0931211 B1 2003-06-04 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CONTROL ACCORDING TO RUNNING TIME

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CONTROL ACCORDING TO RUNNING TIME

Title (de)

LAUFZEITABHÄNGIGE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINENSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE COMMANDE EN FONCTION DE LA DUREE DE FONCTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 0931211 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948726 A

Priority

  • DE 9802243 W
  • DE 19733763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19733763A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for controlling an internal combustion engine, comprising control means influencing at least one relevant control parameter for internal combustion engine fuel consumption, and means to form a value (L) relating to engine run-in status, whereby the control signals of the control means are modified in a given manner according to the above-mentioned value (L).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/061 (2013.01); F02D 41/2422 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

FR 2616481 A1 19881216 - HAMON FRANCOIS [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733763 A1 19990211; EP 0931211 A1 19990728; EP 0931211 B1 20030604; JP 2001502032 A 20010213; KR 20000068683 A 20001125; US 6196196 B1 20010306; WO 9907986 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808619

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-03-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808619 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990818

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB