Global Patent Index - EP 0931275 A4

EP 0931275 A4 2000-03-01 - OPTICAL PROJECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

OPTICAL PROJECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

OPTISCHES PROJEKTIONSGERÄT UND PROJEKTIONSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET TECHNIQUE DE PROJECTION OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 0931275 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96933567 A

Priority

IB 9601129 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815164A2] Certain optical imaging systems exhibit disparate vertical and horizontal image focal surfaces; at least one of which is tipped with respect to the optical axis. The projection optics which illuminates such systems must provide that the vertical image components focus upon the nominal vertical image surface, while the horizontal image components focus on the disparate horizontal image surface. Because at least one of these image surfaces may be tilted with respect to the projection axis, correction is required to maintain focus over the entire image surfaces and to eliminate keystoning. The system may also require differing vertical and horizontal image magnifications as projected upon the above disparate focal surfaces. This invention describes, inter alia, the techniques for meeting these varied requirements, to project a rectilinear object field such that it forms a final focused rectilinear image in a system having tipped and disparate image planes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 27/00; G02B 6/08; H04N 9/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/04 (2006.01); G02B 6/08 (2006.01); G02B 27/00 (2006.01); G03B 21/14 (2006.01); H04N 9/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03B 21/147 (2013.01); G03B 37/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815164 A2 19980416; WO 9815164 A3 19980827; CA 2305268 A1 19980416; CA 2305268 C 20051227; EP 0931275 A1 19990728; EP 0931275 A4 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCRAM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEISER, LEO

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 02B 27/00 A, 7G 02B 6/08 B, 7H 04N 9/31 B

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL